NY A02166 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - substituted by s3250a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - substituted by s3250a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Syracuse regional airport authority.
Title
Creates the Syracuse regional airport authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | Assembly | substituted by s3250a |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.41 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | print number 2166a |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-01-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03250 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.463