NY A02166 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the publication of information regarding awards of state contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the publication of information regarding awards of state contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.592
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4888
2019-03-04SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2019-03-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-28Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.71
2019-02-27Assemblyreported
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to small business

Same As/Similar To

S04888 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2166

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback