NY A02188 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the display of a bus driver's credentials prominently while he or she is on duty and changes the review of his or her files by the department from every three years to annually.
Title
Requires the display of a bus driver's credentials prominently while he or she is on duty and changes the review of his or her files by the department from every three years to annually.
Sponsors
Asm. Ron Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | print number 2188b |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | print number 2188a |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03450 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - referred to transportation