NY A02199 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - substituted by s4203a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to orders committing guardianship and custody of a child; enacts provisions relating to post-termination visitation or contact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to orders committing guardianship and custody of a child; enacts provisions relating to post-termination visitation or contact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted by s4203a
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.244
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.244
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-06Assemblyprint number 2199a
2019-06-06Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-04-08Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04203 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02199&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02199&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02199
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02199&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02199A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02199&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02199&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02199&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback