NY A02218 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - signed chap.189
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - signed chap.189
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions authorizing the town of Greenburgh and specified villages in the towns of Greenburgh and Mount Pleasant to adopt a local law to impose a hotel/motel occupancy tax.
Title
Extends the provisions authorizing the town of Greenburgh and specified villages in the towns of Greenburgh and Mount Pleasant to adopt a local law to impose a hotel/motel occupancy tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Senate | signed chap.189 |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.722 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3404 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.330 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | print number 2218a |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03404 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - signed chap.189