NY A02223 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits any title insurance corporation or title insurance agent, or any other person acting for or on behalf of the title insurance corporation or title insurance agent, from undertaking any usual and customary marketing activity aimed at acquainting present and prospective customers with the advantages of using a particular title insurer or title insurance agent that are not intended for the purpose of a reward for the future placement of, or the past placement, of a particular piece of title insurance business; lays out such permitted practices.
Title
Permits any title insurance corporation or title insurance agent, or any other person acting for or on behalf of the title insurance corporation or title insurance agent, from undertaking any usual and customary marketing activity aimed at acquainting present and prospective customers with the advantages of using a particular title insurer or title insurance agent that are not intended for the purpose of a reward for the future placement of, or the past placement, of a particular piece of title insurance business; lays out such permitted practices.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R] | Asm. Edward Ra [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.95 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.486 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | print number 2223a |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02929 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE