NY A02224 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-10)
Status: Passed on December 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - SIGNED CHAP.572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-10)
Status: Passed on December 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - SIGNED CHAP.572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "nuisance call act"; requires telemarketer's or seller's entity specific do-not-call list; and requires the express written agreement from a consumer before a telemarketer or seller can transmit, share, or otherwise make available any customer's contact information.
Title
Enacts the "nuisance call act"; requires telemarketer's or seller's entity specific do-not-call list; and requires the express written agreement from a consumer before a telemarketer or seller can transmit, share, or otherwise make available any customer's contact information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.572 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.586 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a2224 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.551 |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4777 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.586 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.586 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04777 (Same As) 2019-12-02 - SIGNED CHAP.572