NY A02226 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Ulster county the "John 'Jody' Rossitz Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Ulster county the "John 'Jody' Rossitz Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2226b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.96 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.99 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.99 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 2226a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to transportation |