NY A02236 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows for the imposition of an additional one percent occupancy tax by the city of Lockport, Niagara county to be dedicated to the operation of the Discover Niagara Shuttle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows for the imposition of an additional one percent occupancy tax by the city of Lockport, Niagara county to be dedicated to the operation of the Discover Niagara Shuttle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1755
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2080
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyhome rule request
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.332
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.332
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S02080 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2236

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02236&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02236&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02236
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02236&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02236&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02236&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2236#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback