NY A02241 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to assistance for certain small businesses including dry cleaners and those that practice nail specialty for necessary code related improvements.
Title
Relates to assistance for certain small businesses including dry cleaners and those that practice nail specialty for necessary code related improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S09071 (Same As) 2020-10-28 - REFERRED TO RULES