NY A02263 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the maximum age at which a homeless youth can continue to receive shelter services; raises the age from twenty-one to twenty-four.
Title
Relates to the maximum age at which a homeless youth can continue to receive shelter services; raises the age from twenty-one to twenty-four.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-28 | Assembly | vetoed memo.152 |
2022-12-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.424 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S813 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.526 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S00813 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2263