NY A02276 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - substituted by s565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - substituted by s565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the department of health to review the safety of ultraviolet nail dryers and authorizes the department of state to promulgate any regulations deemed appropriate for governing the use of such devices by any appearance enhancement business conducting the practice of nail specialty.
Title
Relates to requiring the department of health to review the safety of ultraviolet nail dryers and authorizes the department of state to promulgate any regulations deemed appropriate for governing the use of such devices by any appearance enhancement business conducting the practice of nail specialty.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. Nily Rozic [D] |
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s565 |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.496 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00565 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.422