NY A02277 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 81-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - approval memo.4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 81-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - approval memo.4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the use of segregated confinement and creates alternative therapeutic and rehabilitative confinement options; limits the length of time a person may be in segregated confinement and excludes certain persons from being placed in segregated confinement.
Title
Restricts the use of segregated confinement and creates alternative therapeutic and rehabilitative confinement options; limits the length of time a person may be in segregated confinement and excludes certain persons from being placed in segregated confinement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Assembly | approval memo.4 |
2021-03-31 | Assembly | signed chap.93 |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.555 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2836 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.40 |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.40 |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | print number 2277a |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02836 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2277A