NY A02279 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.212
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes cities having a population of between 250,000 and 300,000 to establish a senior citizen longtime resident real property tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes cities having a population of between 250,000 and 300,000 to establish a senior citizen longtime resident real property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.212
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.1668
2018-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6934
2018-02-06SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-02-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-02-06Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.168
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.373
2017-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.373
2017-06-15Assemblyreported
2017-06-13Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 2279a
2017-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-17Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S06864 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGING
S06934 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2279A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02279
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02279A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2279#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback