NY A02283 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to conduct mandatory early screening for dyslexia for all children commencing in pre-kindergarten or kindergarten and continuing thereafter on an annual basis until each child successfully completes second grade; requires school districts to designate an individual to maintain complete and accurate records containing early screening reports for each child, and to provide resources and materials to the parent and/or guardian of any child who displays indications of dyslexia.
Title
Requires school districts to conduct mandatory early screening for dyslexia for all children commencing in pre-kindergarten or kindergarten and continuing thereafter on an annual basis until each child successfully completes second grade; requires school districts to designate an individual to maintain complete and accurate records containing early screening reports for each child, and to provide resources and materials to the parent and/or guardian of any child who displays indications of dyslexia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 2283a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01293 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION