NY A02285 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to personal phone calls for inmates in certain circumstances.
Title
Relates to personal phone calls for inmates in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.261 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.25 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1850 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.28 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01850 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.261