NY A02286 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to water saving performance standards; aligns water saving performance standards with the WaterSense Program guidelines developed by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to water saving performance standards; aligns water saving performance standards with the WaterSense Program guidelines developed by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-30Senate3RD READING CAL.485
2019-04-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S354A
2019-04-30SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-04-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-30Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.183
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S00354 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2286

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback