NY A02299 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s2655b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits smoking in public parks; sets $50 fine; defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits smoking in public parks; sets $50 fine; defines terms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s2655b
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.680
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 2299b
2019-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-31Assemblyprint number 2299a
2019-05-31Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S02655 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.680

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02299&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02299&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02299
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02299&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02299A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02299&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02299B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02299&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02299&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02299&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback