NY A02326 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - substituted by s3291
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the creation of a drug guide for seniors regarding the drugs commonly used by people over 62 years of age; provides that such guide will include functions and drug interactions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the creation of a drug guide for seniors regarding the drugs commonly used by people over 62 years of age; provides that such guide will include functions and drug interactions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20Assemblysubstituted by s3291
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.332
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-02-12Assemblyprint number 2326a
2019-02-12Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-02-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S03291 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback