NY A02331 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enables veterans and reservists to receive benefit information upon applying for or renewing a driver's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enables veterans and reservists to receive benefit information upon applying for or renewing a driver's license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-02-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-27Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.59
2019-02-12Assemblyreported
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S01026 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback