NY A02355 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing a nursing home patient, or his or her representative, to install, operate and maintain, at his or her own expense, an electronic monitoring device in his or her room.
Title
Relates to allowing a nursing home patient, or his or her representative, to install, operate and maintain, at his or her own expense, an electronic monitoring device in his or her room.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | print number 2355a |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03786 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH