NY A02451 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the discontinuation of utility service to residential customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the discontinuation of utility service to residential customers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.213
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-14Senate3RD READING CAL.1787
2018-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3644
2018-02-27SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2018-02-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-02-27Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.194
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-03-07SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2017-03-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-03-07Assemblypassed assembly
2017-03-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.100
2017-03-01Assemblyreported
2017-01-20Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S03644 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2451

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback