NY A02459 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - signed chap.571
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - signed chap.571
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing information on where to seek help in regards to military sexual trauma; requires the division of veterans' affairs to provide information regarding resources that are available to assist veterans who experienced military sexual trauma while on active duty or during military training, by maintaining a military sexual trauma portal on the division's internet website.
Title
Relates to providing information on where to seek help in regards to military sexual trauma; requires the division of veterans' affairs to provide information regarding resources that are available to assist veterans who experienced military sexual trauma while on active duty or during military training, by maintaining a military sexual trauma portal on the division's internet website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | Senate | signed chap.571 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1385 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5006A |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.42 |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | print number 2459a |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S05006 (Same As) 2019-12-02 - signed chap.571