NY A02462 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a pension benefit parity payment to certain retirees from a state management/confidential position.
Title
Provides a pension benefit parity payment to certain retirees from a state management/confidential position.
Sponsors
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Colin Schmitt [R] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S00899 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04079 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
S04079 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE