NY A02475 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - advanced to third reading cal.230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Awards attorney's fees and expert witness fees in appropriate cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Awards attorney's fees and expert witness fees in appropriate cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.230
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-04-08Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04129 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback