NY A02478 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires specification of the average weekly paid wage to employees in contractors' annual employment reports, and requires such reports to be made available in a searchable public database on the public website of the state procurement council.
Title
Requires specification of the average weekly paid wage to employees in contractors' annual employment reports, and requires such reports to be made available in a searchable public database on the public website of the state procurement council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |