NY A02480 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets limits on severance packages equal to three months salary for public at-will employees not subject to a collective bargaining agreement or union contract.
Title
Sets limits on severance packages equal to three months salary for public at-will employees not subject to a collective bargaining agreement or union contract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.595 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.489 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | substituted for a2480 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.369 |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s4292 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.489 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04292 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.595