NY A02481 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.288
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.288
Summary
Relates to the checks of registrants and information notice by mail.
Title
Relates to the checks of registrants and information notice by mail; provides that between August first and August fifth of each year the board of elections shall notify individuals of their polling place and other information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-22 | substituted by s4244 | |
2009-03-12 | advanced to third reading cal.219 | |
2009-03-11 | reported | |
2009-03-06 | print number 2481a | |
2009-03-06 | amend and recommit to election law | |
2009-01-16 | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04244 (Same As) 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.288
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02481&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |