NY A02484 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes merit time allowance credits and certain administrative privileges credits for local correctional facilities for eligible inmates.
Title
Establishes merit time allowance credits and certain administrative privileges credits for local correctional facilities for eligible inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.110 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2484a |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.335 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00216 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES