NY A02539 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an exception for victims of child sexual abuse to the trust exemption from application to the satisfaction of a money judgment; allows victims of sexual abuse to enforce a money judgment against their abusers' trusts when the judgment was obtained as a result of such abuse; defines child sexual abuse.
Title
Establishes an exception for victims of child sexual abuse to the trust exemption from application to the satisfaction of a money judgment; allows victims of sexual abuse to enforce a money judgment against their abusers' trusts when the judgment was obtained as a result of such abuse; defines child sexual abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.112 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.490 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | print number 2539a |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04312 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY