NY A02554 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.689
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.689
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits commercial leases from including a waiver of the right to a declaratory judgment action and states that the inclusion of such a waiver in a commercial lease shall be null and void as against public policy.
Title
Prohibits commercial leases from including a waiver of the right to a declaratory judgment action and states that the inclusion of such a waiver in a commercial lease shall be null and void as against public policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.689 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1346 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5614 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.284 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05614 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.689