NY A02557 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-07 - print number 2557a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-07 - print number 2557a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study on the number of children who are caregivers and how being a caregiver impacts their education.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study on the number of children who are caregivers and how being a caregiver impacts their education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | print number 2557a |
2020-10-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02170 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to education