NY A02559 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a tax check-off box on personal income tax and corporate franchise tax returns for gifts to the New York state horse retirement and rescue fund; and directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to compile a list of approved horse retirement and rescue programs.
Title
Provides for a tax check-off box on personal income tax and corporate franchise tax returns for gifts to the New York state horse retirement and rescue fund; and directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to compile a list of approved horse retirement and rescue programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2559a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.114 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.102 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.102 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02615 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE