NY A02600 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 2600a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 2600a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a state party from using the word "Independent" or "Independence" in its name.
Title
Prohibits a state party from using the word "Independent" or "Independence" in its name.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2600a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.115 |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.32 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01628 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS