NY A02601 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of a portion of fines issued for illegally passing a school bus to the comprehensive school bus driver safety training program for the study and promotion of issues involving school bus safety; establishes a school bus motorist education fund.
Title
Provides for the transfer of a portion of fines issued for illegally passing a school bus to the comprehensive school bus driver safety training program for the study and promotion of issues involving school bus safety; establishes a school bus motorist education fund.
Sponsors
Asm. David Gantt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04385 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION