NY A02602 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - print number 2602a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - print number 2602a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination of students on school property or at a school function based on religious attire.
Title
Prohibits discrimination of students on school property or at a school function based on religious attire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Assembly | print number 2602a |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08637 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES