NY A02611 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - ordered to third reading rules cal.335
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of consumer credit history in hiring, employment and licensing determinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of consumer credit history in hiring, employment and licensing determinations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.335
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.335
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-12Assemblyprint number 2611d
2019-06-12Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-06-10Assemblyprint number 2611c
2019-06-10Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-05-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-20Assemblyprint number 2611b
2019-03-20Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-02-08Assemblyprint number 2611a
2019-02-08Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-01-24Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S02884 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02611&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02611&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02611
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02611&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02611A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02611&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02611B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02611&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02611C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02611&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02611D
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02611&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02611&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02611&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback