NY A02621 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to price gouging; imposes criminal penalties for price gouging; removes language relating to the declaration of a state of emergency; increases civil penalty; authorizes a district attorney to enforce provisions.
Title
Relates to price gouging; imposes criminal penalties for price gouging; removes language relating to the declaration of a state of emergency; increases civil penalty; authorizes a district attorney to enforce provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S01642 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION