NY A02625 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes time restrictions for court issued consent orders for work performance to remove or remedy dangerous conditions or building code violations; permits sixty days for consent orders to be performed by an owner, mortgagee, or lienor of record and further restricts such person from using consent orders more than once.
Title
Establishes time restrictions for court issued consent orders for work performance to remove or remedy dangerous conditions or building code violations; permits sixty days for consent orders to be performed by an owner, mortgagee, or lienor of record and further restricts such person from using consent orders more than once.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.251 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-02-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.390 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3320 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.117 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.132 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03320 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.251