NY A02634 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits physicians who are licensed in another state or territory to provide medical services to athletes and team personnel at team sporting events in New York, provided such services are provided only to those athletes and team personnel at the team sporting event.
Title
Permits physicians who are licensed in another state or territory to provide medical services to athletes and team personnel at team sporting events in New York, provided such services are provided only to those athletes and team personnel at the team sporting event.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.199 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.106 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | substituted for a2634 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.19 |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | substituted by s1276 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.106 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01276 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.199