NY A02652 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the unilateral diminution of health insurance benefits of public employee retirees and their dependents or reducing the employer's contributions for such insurance from May 1, 2008 until May 15, 2018; defines employers to include the state, municipalities, school districts, and public authorities and commissions.
Title
Prohibits the unilateral diminution of health insurance benefits of public employee retirees and their dependents or reducing the employer's contributions for such insurance from May 1, 2008 until May 15, 2018; defines employers to include the state, municipalities, school districts, and public authorities and commissions.
Sponsors
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Christopher Friend [R] |
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |