NY A02653 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.363
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the monetary exclusion on the requirement of plain language in consumer contracts from $100,000 to $250,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the monetary exclusion on the requirement of plain language in consumer contracts from $100,000 to $250,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11Senatesigned chap.363
2019-10-01Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.699
2019-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3704
2019-03-27SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-03-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-27Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.151
2019-03-19Assemblyreported
2019-03-06Assemblyprint number 2653a
2019-03-06Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2019-01-24Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S03704 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2653A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02653&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02653&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02653
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02653&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02653A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02653&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02653&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2653#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback