NY A02682 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - SIGNED CHAP.411
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - SIGNED CHAP.411
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the voter friendly ballot act; relates to the form of the ballot for elections; removes additional provisions for primary elections for New York city.
Title
Enacts the voter friendly ballot act; relates to the form of the ballot for elections; removes additional provisions for primary elections for New York city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.411 |
2019-10-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.33 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | substituted for a2682a |
2019-03-05 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | AMENDED 2300A |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.160 |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | substituted by s2300a |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2682a |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-04 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.33 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S02300 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - SIGNED CHAP.411