NY A02690 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a waiting period before a firearm, shotgun or rifle may be delivered to a person; requires either the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS) or its successor has issued a "proceed" response to the licensee, or thirty calendar days have elapsed since the date the licensee, seller, transferor or dealer contacted NICS to initiate a national instant criminal background check and NICS has not notified the licensee, seller, transferor or dealer that the transfer of the firearm, rifle or shotgun to such person should be denied.
Title
Establishes a waiting period before a firearm, shotgun or rifle may be delivered to a person; requires either the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS) or its successor has issued a "proceed" response to the licensee, or thirty calendar days have elapsed since the date the licensee, seller, transferor or dealer contacted NICS to initiate a national instant criminal background check and NICS has not notified the licensee, seller, transferor or dealer that the transfer of the firearm, rifle or shotgun to such person should be denied.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.129 |
2019-07-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-01-29 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-01-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-29 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.25 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | substituted for a2690 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.89 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | substituted by s2374 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.25 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.25 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02374 (Same As) 2019-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.129