NY A02698 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - substituted by s726a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing the issuance of a license to certain motion picture theatres; authorizes the issuance of a license to a parcel located in Brooklyn.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing the issuance of a license to certain motion picture theatres; authorizes the issuance of a license to a parcel located in Brooklyn.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted by s726a
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.249
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.249
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-15Assemblyprint number 2698a
2019-05-15Assemblyamend and recommit to economic development
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S00726 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02698&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02698&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02698
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02698&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02698A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02698&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02698&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02698&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02698&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4

Bill Comments

feedback