NY A02720 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the state energy planning board to conduct a study of the technical and economic feasibility of a one hundred percent renewable energy system and a reduction in greenhouse gas emissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the state energy planning board to conduct a study of the technical and economic feasibility of a one hundred percent renewable energy system and a reduction in greenhouse gas emissions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-07Assemblyprint number 2720b
2019-03-07Assemblyamend and recommit to energy
2019-02-21Assemblyprint number 2720a
2019-02-21Assemblyamend and recommit to energy
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S02352 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2352B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback