NY A02756 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - restored to third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - restored to third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every mandated reporter to make a report to the register unless the register has knowledge of the incident.
Title
Requires every mandated reporter to make a report to the register unless the register has knowledge of the incident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Assembly | restored to third reading |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 2756 |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 2756a |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.421 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2019-01-25 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S01143 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES