NY A02761 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a Latina suicide prevention task force; provides for the number of members, manner of appointment and the topics to be reviewed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a Latina suicide prevention task force; provides for the number of members, manner of appointment and the topics to be reviewed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-08Assemblyprint number 2761a
2019-05-08Assemblyamend and recommit to mental health
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S03806 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback