NY A02763 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-6)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - print number 2763a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - print number 2763a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public display of tobacco advertisements and smoking paraphernalia within five hundred feet of schools; imposes a maximum penalty of five hundred dollars per violation; exempts tobacco businesses from the prohibition.
Title
Prohibits public display of tobacco advertisements and smoking paraphernalia within five hundred feet of schools; imposes a maximum penalty of five hundred dollars per violation; exempts tobacco businesses from the prohibition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | print number 2763a |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-01-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06766 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES