NY A02786 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the filing and paying of otherwise-valid medical assistance claims that are not timely filed due to the implementation of a new or upgraded electronic medical record system.
Title
Permits the filing and paying of otherwise-valid medical assistance claims that are not timely filed due to the implementation of a new or upgraded electronic medical record system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01818 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN